You may also like

problem icon

Double Digit

Choose two digits and arrange them to make two double-digit numbers. Now add your double-digit numbers. Now add your single digit numbers. Divide your double-digit answer by your single-digit answer. Try lots of examples. What happens? Can you explain it?

problem icon

Mindreader

A little bit of algebra explains this 'magic'. Ask a friend to pick 3 consecutive numbers and to tell you a multiple of 3. Then ask them to add the four numbers and multiply by 67, and to tell you the last two digits of her answer. Now you can really amaze her by giving the whole answer and the three consecutive numbers used at the start.

problem icon

Quick Times

32 x 38 = 30 x 40 + 2 x 8; 34 x 36 = 30 x 40 + 4 x 6; 56 x 54 = 50 x 60 + 6 x 4; 73 x 77 = 70 x 80 + 3 x 7 Verify and generalise if possible.

Pyramids

Stage: 3 Challenge Level: Challenge Level:1
This problem offers an opportunity of doing some simple arithmetic with positive and negative numbers, and a good context for introducing algebraic expressions.

Teachers may want to work through an example to ensure students understand the problem.

There is a similar interactive version in Number Pyramids